U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20302
  • Case Name: Christopher Fort and Megan Fort
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule J]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule I]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule G]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule H]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule D]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule C]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.