U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Cardoza et al v. Western Express Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 06, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 02, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Supplement]
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 23, 2020: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 16, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 16, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 11, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 11, 2020: [Opposition]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reply Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2020: [Response]
  • November 24, 2020: [Brief]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appendix]
  • November 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 20, 2020: [Response]
  • November 17, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: [In Limine]
  • November 10, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 10, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2020: [In Limine]
  • November 09, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 09, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 31, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 20, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 12, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 12, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 03, 2019: [Vacate]
  • July 01, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • June 11, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 10, 2019: [Consolidate Cases for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 10, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • June 10, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 10, 2019: [Counterclaim]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 20, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 18, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.