U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20310
  • Case Name: Sonny Kay Olsen and Melissa LaVonne Olsen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.