U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20314
  • Case Name: Gerald R Yaffa and Christine A Yaffa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Generic Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Generic Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Generic Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Generic Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Approving Modification of Plan (All Chapters)]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice ]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modified Plan]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [To Amend Order]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • January 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Filing of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Order]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Take Notice]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.