U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Steele v. Graves Ranch Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript - SEALED]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Response]
  • December 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Response]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Mediation]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response]
  • November 18, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 17, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Supplement]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • February 26, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Lift Stay]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Status Report]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 09, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Brief]
  • December 16, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • September 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 05, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 29, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 26, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • August 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.