U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Heigis v. Peak Wellness Center Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 05, 2019: [Reply Brief]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 24, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 19, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 10, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 07, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.