U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20318
  • Case Name: Gelena Jo Kent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • May 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.