U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Connell v. National Outdoor Leadership School et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 08, 2020: [Opposition]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 20, 2019: [Opposition]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Response]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Praecipe]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.