U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Schumacker v. BRP US Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • December 29, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 29, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 03, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 15, 2021: [Vacate]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Witness List]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 27, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Vacate]
  • December 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 13, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 07, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 04, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 05, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 04, 2020: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 28, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 28, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 25, 2019: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 20, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Status Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • June 20, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • May 31, 2019: [Removal]
  • May 24, 2019: [Complaint]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.