U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Sheriff v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Letter(s)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Response]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 28, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.