U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20326
  • Case Name: Anthony F Torres
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Default Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Special Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Status Report]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Proposed Abandonment of Property of the Estate]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exhibit]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Declaration]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.