U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00111
  • Case Name: DeHerrera v. Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 03, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 01, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • August 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 31, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 21, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.