U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Bush et al v. Pierce et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 19, 2020: [Vacate]
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Report Order]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Vacate]
  • May 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 18, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 06, 2019: [Financial Entry]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.