U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20349
  • Case Name: Hydro Logistix Holdings LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.