U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20359
  • Case Name: Aaron Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Property Sold]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
  • September 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.