U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02005
  • Case Name: Wilcox v. Security State Bank
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Remand]
  • August 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Counterclaim]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • July 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Remand]
  • July 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.