U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20364
  • Case Name: Sharon E. Talich
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
July, 2020
  • July 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2020
  • May 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Property Sold]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacating Order]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Sell Property]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Limit Notice]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
September, 2019
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exemption from Credit Counseling]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Exemption from Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appointment Rejection]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.