U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20366
  • Case Name: Chersten Crumm
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.