U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Washington v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Corperal Property Officer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Letter(s)]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Letter(s)]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Letter(s)]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Objection]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 27, 2021: [Response]
  • January 15, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 14, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2020: [Martinez Report]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 30, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 10, 2020: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 26, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • March 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response]
  • November 05, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 04, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.