U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20373
  • Case Name: Gabriela Marissa Landa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule J]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule I]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule H]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule G]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule E/F]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule D]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.