U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Becerra v. Schultz
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • December 28, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 24, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • August 24, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • July 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 20, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 14, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Strike]
  • June 09, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Witness List]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 12, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2019: [Removal]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Complaint]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.