open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming

WYOMING PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:19-20375
    Party Name:April Grace Shupe
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wyb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49302
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =