U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00119
  • Case Name: CUCU Inc v. Slickwraps Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Consent Decree]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 05, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 25, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 18, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 02, 2019: [Praecipe]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 12, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • June 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.