U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00121
  • Case Name: American Petroleum Institute v. United States Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • November 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • November 05, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 04, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 03, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 03, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 20, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Brief]
  • December 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Opposition]
  • August 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 14, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • August 08, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 31, 2019: [Intervene]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 25, 2019: [Intervene]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • June 13, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • June 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.