U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20378
  • Case Name: George Robert Larive
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Intent]
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.