U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20382
  • Case Name: Christopher LeRoy Jones and Michelle Daneen Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
December, 2020
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.