U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Coy v. CTS Logistics Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 15, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Status Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • June 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.