U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Young v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 09, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2019: [Response]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 14, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.