U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Tanner v. Swift Transportation CO of Arizona LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 05, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.