U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Salcedo v. Transco Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • December 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 06, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 17, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.