U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20383
  • Case Name: Black Heart Farms, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
July, 2020
  • July 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auctioneers Statement of Property Sold]
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Abandonment of Property]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Abandon]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.