U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Pascarelli v. Marriott International Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 27, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 10, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 03, 2019: [Reply Brief]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • October 22, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.