U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Kozar v. Casper Medical Center LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 18, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • March 13, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.