U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Winscher v. Rentokil North America Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 10, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • September 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 02, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • July 02, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 20, 2019: [Removal]
  • June 19, 2019: [Complaint]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.