U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Blackburn et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Reply to Response]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Opposition]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Mandate]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • January 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 14, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.