U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20403
  • Case Name: Justin Michael McKinney and Jessica Lynn McKinney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.