U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Wingfield v. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 26, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 05, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Witness List]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 25, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.