U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20416
  • Case Name: Cindie Michelle Thurgood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Intent]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Take Notice]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.