U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Pauna et al v. Swift Transportation CO of Arizona LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 23, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 17, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 03, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 02, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 12, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 10, 2020: [Entry of Default]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 04, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • June 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.