U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Mendoza et al v. Ace Hardware Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2020: [In Limine]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • April 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.