U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Coleman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 23, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • January 17, 2020: [Remand]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 18, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.