U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Cox v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 09, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • November 07, 2019: [Response]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2019: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.