U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20436
  • Case Name: Samantha Margaret Zupan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compromise]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compromise]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule A/B]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.