U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 19, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Response]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • June 22, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 23, 2019: [Opposition]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response]
  • December 02, 2019: [Show Cause]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2019: [Martinez Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 01, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Service of Process]
  • August 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.