U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Andrew Kean v. Devon Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 01, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stay Case]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • May 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 26, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Response]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply Brief]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 11, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 13, 2019: [Crossclaim]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 23, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 23, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • July 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.