U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Talcott v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 04, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response]
  • January 11, 2022: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • July 28, 2021: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Bench Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bench Trial]
  • July 22, 2021: [Bench Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 21, 2021: [Bench Trial]
  • July 20, 2021: [Deposition]
  • July 20, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 20, 2021: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 19, 2021: [Add Party]
  • July 19, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 19, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • July 16, 2021: [Statement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 09, 2021: [Statement]
  • July 09, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Statement]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 14, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 11, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 08, 2021: [Opposition]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 06, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • May 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • April 10, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • April 10, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 09, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 04, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.