U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Safeway Stores 46 Inc v. WY Plaza LC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 08, 2021: [Vacate]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • November 25, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • November 25, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 25, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 23, 2020: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 12, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 12, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Designation]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 22, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 09, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.