U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Langer v. Rentokil North America Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • July 22, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • July 22, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • July 15, 2019: [Removal]
  • July 12, 2019: [Complaint]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.