U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on 2255 Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 15, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.