U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Forward Cody Wyoming Inc v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Consent Decree]
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Recusal]
  • July 15, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.